Appendix A. Membership And Organization Boards And Commissions
Latest version.
APPENDIX A MEMBERSHIP AND ORGANIZATION BOARDS AND COMMISSIONS
PLANNING COMMISSION
Original Committee August 10, 1953 Commission Francque Mellot Meyers Patterson Sampson Weimer Wilson March 1, 1954 Francque Mellot Meyers Patterson Sampson Weimer Wilson February 7, 1955 Resigns March 14, 1955 Hart April 18, 1955 Francque Hart Meyers Patterson Sampson Weimer Wilson August 8, 1955 Resigns August 15, 1955 Tobias January 3, 1956 Resigns January 16, 1956 Aldrich April 16, 1956 Resigns Resigns April 17, 1956 Francque Wood Sampson Dudek Wilson April 15, 1957 Tobias Aldrich June 17, 1957 Resigns July 22, 1957 Martin February 14, 1958 Died March 17, 1958 Resigns April 21, 1958 Wood July 21, 1958 Resigns August 4, 1958 Jordan April 6, 1959 Jordan Dudek March 7, 1960 Warren Hostetler April 4, 1960 Resigns Resigns April 18, 1960 Martin Hostetler Reade April 17, 1961 Warren June 19, 1961 Resigns April 23, 1962 Wood May 21, 1962 Duran April 8, 1963 Jordan Reade August 19, 1963 Resigns August 19, 1963 Hammett September 21, 1964 Resigns September 21, 1964 Beck November 29, 1965 Resigns Resigns November 29, 1965 Reade Hout April 18, 1966 Wood April 3, 1967 Hammett Beck April 16, 1968 Hout April 21, 1969 Reade October 13, 1969 Leonhardt April 21, 1970 Resigns April 21, 1970 Wood June 22, 1970 Clarke June 7, 1971 Beck June 7, 1971 Clarke June 5, 1972 Reappointed October 2, 1972 Resigns October 23, 1972 McFarland June 5, 1972 Reappointed May 7, 1973 Reappointed April 16, 1974 Reappointed Schafer April 1, 1975 Reappointed Reappointed March 1, 1976 Resigns April 19, 1976 Carstensen Reappointed Hall Lorenzini Reappointed April 17, 1978 Price June 19, 1978 Reappointed Reappointed August 7, 1978 Resigns October 19, 1978 Di Domenico Thyen June 18, 1980 Davenport Sawyer-Watson Van Aken December 7, 1981 Resigns January 20, 1982 Sloate December 20, 1982 Term Extended Term Extended February 14, 1983 Reappointed Reappointed Reappointed De Carlo Markel February 20, 1985 Buffa Erickson Andreen PLANNING COMMISSION ORGANIZATION
Term Expires Walter Davenport, 1888 Parkview Circle February 28, 1987 Clarence C. Clarke, 1079 Corona Lane February 28, 1987 Peter F. Buffa, 2824 Nevis Circle February 28, 1989 Joseph A. Erickson, 728 Center Street February 28, 1989 Francis L. (Roy) Andreen, 2769 Cibola Avenue February 28, 1989 VEHICLE PARKING DISTRICT NO. 1
December 20, 1954 Mrs. Evelyn Green Roy McCardle R. D. Flaherty January 24, 1955 Resigns January 24, 1955 Dr. S. R. Frazier December 20, 1956 Mrs. Green (1 year) McCardle (3 years) Dr. Frazier (2 years) December 17, 1957 Mrs. Green (3 years) April 21, 1958 Dr. Frazier (3 years) July 7, 1958 Resigns July 21, 1958 Bob Reed December 21, 1959 Bob Reed (3 years) December 19, 1960 Mrs. Green (3 years) April 17, 1961 Dr. Frazier (3 years) January 7, 1963 Reappointed July 13, 1963 Died September 16, 1963 William R. Scott June 15, 1964 Dom Raciti Ralph Martin February 7, 1966 Reappointed August 1, 1966 Resigns August 15, 1966 H. Calvin Stilley March 20, 1967 Reappointed April 3, 1967 Reappointed March 3, 1969 Reappointed October 6, 1969 Resigned October 6, 1969 J. C. Humphries May 4, 1970 Resigns May 4, 1970 Robert Raciti Reappointed August 7, 1972 Reappointed BOARD ORGANIZATION—1973
Term Expires Robert Raciti, 1838 Newport Boulevard March 20, 1973 H. Calvin Stilley, 1780 Newport Boulevard February 7, 1975 J. C. Humphries, 1823 Newport Boulevard April 17, 1973 VEHICLE PARKING DISTRICT NO. 2
November 19, 1956 Hugh B. Springer (3 years) William B. Brown(1 year) John W. Smith (2 years) June 17, 1957 Resigns July 1, 1957 Harvey Somers July 8, 1957 Resigns July 15, 1957 Resigns July 22, 1957 E. R. Carr (left city) Herb McDonald October 7, 1957 Cye Vaughn November 18, 1957 Reappointed (3 years) April 21, 1958 Resigns May 5, 1958 James Turley November 3, 1958 Resigns April 6, 1959 Gordon McClellan April 20, 1959 Herb McDonald December 21, 1959 Gene Aldrich January 4, 1960 Resigns January 18, 1960 Dr. Robert Andrews December 19, 1960 James Flagg May 1, 1961 Reappointed November 6, 1961 Reappointed September 1, 1963 Resigns September 16, 1963 Lee Swenson June 15, 1964 Reappointed Reappointed Donald D. Seymour November 2, 1964 Reappointed November 21, 1966 Reappointed June 27, 1967 Reappointed November 20, 1967 Reappointed July 15, 1968 Died July 15, 1968 Frank Zrebiec May 4, 1970 Resigns May 4, 1970 Reappointed Dr. S. R. Nord November 16, 1970 Reappointed February 5, 1973 Reappointed BOARD ORGANIZATION—1973
Term Expires Frank Zrebiec, 1851 Newport Boulevard November 19, 1973 Dr. S. R. Nord, 300 Victoria Street November 21, 1975 Dr. Robert Andrews, 1879 Newport Boulevard May 1, 1973 TRANSPORTATION (TRAFFIC) COMMISSION
(Formerly created by Resolution No. 608, adopted May 18, 1959. Enlarged by Resolution No. 64-75, adopted August 3, 1964)
April 15, 1957 Francis Cheatham, G. P. Parmelee, Paul R. Dunlap, A. R. McKenzie, D. Southworth, C. L. Heller. May 20, 1959 Francis Cheatham, G. P. Parmelee, Paul R. Dunlap, A. R. McKenzie, D. Southworth, C. L. Heller, Carl Zeise. September 8, 1959 Frank Myers, Chairman, Francis Cheatham, G. P. Parmelee, Paul R. Dunlap, A. R. McKenzie, D. Southworth, C. L. Heller. April 17, 1961 Frank Myers, Chairman, Francis Cheatham, G. P. Parmelee, William R. Scott, A. R. McKenzie, D. Southworth, C. L. Heller. April 15, 1963 Reappointed. August 3, 1964 A. R. McKenzie, Alva Williams, Francis Cheatham, G. P. Parmelee, Harley Bogart, Mrs. Mildred Mathews, Lou Benny. October 24, 1966 Reappointed. February 19, 1968 Alva Williams, Jr., Francis Cheatham, Paul Fowler, Harley Bogart, Roger Neth, Joe Kroll, John Connell, Mrs. Mildred Mathews, George Madsen. April 21, 1970 Mrs. Mildred Mathews, Francis Cheatham, Mannie Puentes, Joe Kroll, John Connell, Harley Bogart, Lt. H. A. Fischer, James H. Eldridge. April 18, 1972 Bill Anderson replaced Harley Bogart; and Lt. A. G. Smith replaced Lt. H. A. Fischer; other members same; no formal action taken by Council.